NY A05823 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.217
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires notice to adjoining owners of construction or demolition work at the time such application for approval is submitted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires notice to adjoining owners of construction or demolition work at the time such application for approval is submitted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.217
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1555
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4519A
2018-03-20SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2018-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.417
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-19SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-06-19Senatereturned to senate
2017-06-19Assemblyrepassed assembly
2017-06-14Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 5823b
2017-06-14Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2017-06-14AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14Senaterecalled from senate
2017-04-26SenateREFERRED TO CITIES
2017-04-26Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-04-26Assemblypassed assembly
2017-04-24Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.60
2017-04-24Assemblyrules report cal.60
2017-04-24Assemblyreported
2017-04-04Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-03-23Assemblyprint number 5823a
2017-03-23Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2017-03-22Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-02-16Assemblyreferred to cities

Same As/Similar To

S04519 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5823B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05823
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05823A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05823B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05823&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A5823#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback