NY A05838 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to adding substances to the schedules of controlled substances including those already listed under 21 U.S.C. Section 812.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to adding substances to the schedules of controlled substances including those already listed under 21 U.S.C. Section 812.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.358
2019-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.358
2019-06-17Assemblyreported
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-13Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-06-07Assemblyprint number 5838a
2019-06-07Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2019-02-19Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S03416 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3416A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05838
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05838A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05838&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback