NY A05840 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Westchester to impose an additional rate of sales and compensating use tax; extends the Westchester county spending limitation act.
Title
Authorizes the county of Westchester to impose an additional rate of sales and compensating use tax; extends the Westchester county spending limitation act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.171 |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | amended by restoring to previous print 5840a |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | print number 5840b |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | print number 5840a |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04940 (Same As) 2019-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.44