NY A05841 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - signed chap.41
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the definition of interim multiple dwelling units; authorizes claims originating in the loft board to be brought in civil court; amends how rents in interim dwelling units are controlled; subjects cooperative and condominium units to certain rent regulations; makes certain provisions relating to such permanent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends the definition of interim multiple dwelling units; authorizes claims originating in the loft board to be brought in civil court; amends how rents in interim dwelling units are controlled; subjects cooperative and condominium units to certain rent regulations; makes certain provisions relating to such permanent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25Senatesigned chap.41
2019-06-14Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-30SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30Senate3RD READING CAL.1003
2019-05-30SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3655B
2019-05-15SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT
2019-05-15Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-05-15Assemblypassed assembly
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.202
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-26Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-20Assemblyprint number 5841a
2019-03-20Assemblyamend and recommit to housing
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to housing

Same As/Similar To

S03655 (Same As) 2019-05-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5841A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05841&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05841&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05841
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05841&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05841A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05841&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05841&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05841&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5841#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback