NY A05854 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any municipality which receives and responds to 4 or more calls for emergency medical service for an individual to report the circumstances of such calls to the local social services district and the office of the medicaid inspector general.
Title
Requires any municipality which receives and responds to 4 or more calls for emergency medical service for an individual to report the circumstances of such calls to the local social services district and the office of the medicaid inspector general.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] |
Asm. Michael Norris [R] | Asm. Robert Smullen [R] | Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in local governments |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00903 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT