NY A05878 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the payment of state aid to the town of New Hudson and special districts therein for state land operated by the department of environmental conservation.
Title
Provides for the payment of state aid to the town of New Hudson and special districts therein for state land operated by the department of environmental conservation.
Sponsors
Asm. Joseph Giglio [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. Peter Lawrence [R] |
Asm. Brian Miller [R] | Asm. John Salka [R] | Asm. Angelo Morinello [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-16 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01044 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07218 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S07218 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS