NY A05889 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 17-11)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to correction
Pending: Assembly Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts "The Domestic Violence Protection Act - Brittany's Law" requiring registration of violent felony offenders; sets forth duties of the division of criminal justice services; establishes a special telephone number; requires the division to maintain a subdirectory of violent predators.
Title
Enacts "The Domestic Violence Protection Act - Brittany's Law" requiring registration of violent felony offenders; sets forth duties of the division of criminal justice services; establishes a special telephone number; requires the division to maintain a subdirectory of violent predators.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to correction |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00963 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04644 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06721 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04644 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06721 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN