NY A05895 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2019.
Title
Provides total disability benefits for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers for injuries sustained on or after July 1, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04631 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - PRINT NUMBER 4631A