NY A05896 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-2)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.461
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - advanced to third reading cal.461
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to prohibiting homeowners' associations from restricting the installation of or use of solar power systems.
Title
Relates to prohibiting homeowners' associations from restricting the installation of or use of solar power systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.461 |
2020-03-03 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | print number 5896a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S04742 (Same As) 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES