NY A05907 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to establish gift cards for distinctive and special number license plates.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of motor vehicles to establish gift cards for distinctive and special number license plates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-09 | Assembly | print number 5907a |
2014-05-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-03-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |