NY A05907 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-3)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - print number 5907a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-18 - print number 5907a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes topical oxygen wound therapy as a Medicaid benefit.
Title
Establishes topical oxygen wound therapy as a Medicaid benefit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-18 | Assembly | print number 5907a |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-03-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04185 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - referred to health