NY A05931 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the New York state interagency coordinating council for service-disabled veterans; defines the powers and duties of the council and requires an annual report by the council to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the New York state interagency coordinating council for service-disabled veterans; defines the powers and duties of the council and requires an annual report by the council to the governor, the temporary president of the senate and the speaker of the assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-28Senatetabled
2018-12-28Senatevetoed memo.330
2018-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-11SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11Senate3RD READING CAL.1689
2018-06-11SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8864
2018-05-30SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2018-05-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-22Assemblyamended on third reading 5931a
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.426
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-22SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2017-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-04Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.291
2017-05-02Assemblyreported
2017-03-22Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-02-17Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S02424 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - referred to veterans' affairs
S08864 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5931A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05931&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05931&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05931
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05931&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05931A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05931&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05931&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05931&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A5931#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback