NY A05940 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members and reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members and reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1762
2019-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3659
2019-06-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-18Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.140
2019-06-11Assemblyrules report cal.140
2019-06-11Assemblyreported
2019-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S03659 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5940

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05940&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05940&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05940
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05940&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05940&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05940&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05940&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5940#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback