NY A05944 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - delivered to governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes references of gravity knives as a dangerous weapon from certain provisions of the penal law relating to firearms and other dangerous weapons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes references of gravity knives as a dangerous weapon from certain provisions of the penal law relating to firearms and other dangerous weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-05-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-13Senate3RD READING CAL.588
2019-05-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4863
2019-04-10SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2019-04-10Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-04-10Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-21Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.161
2019-03-18Assemblyreported
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S03898 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04863 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5944

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback