NY A05952 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.228
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits unfair discrimination by insurers for individuals that use prescriptions to block the effects of opioids.
Title
Prohibits unfair discrimination by insurers for individuals that use prescriptions to block the effects of opioids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-07 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.228 |
2020-09-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.163 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5952a |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-01-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.71 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-01-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Senate | died in assembly |
2019-05-06 | Senate | referred to insurance |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.464 |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3159A |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3159a |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.163 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | print number 5952a |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to insurance |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03159 (Same As) 2020-10-07 - SIGNED CHAP.228