NY A05955 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - signed chap.503
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Airmont building inspectors, fire inspectors and code enforcement officers to live in the county of Rockland or an adjoining county.
Title
Authorizes the village of Airmont building inspectors, fire inspectors and code enforcement officers to live in the county of Rockland or an adjoining county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.503 |
2019-11-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1499 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4112 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.146 |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04112 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - signed chap.503