NY A05957 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on December 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.84
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to proof of eligibility for volunteer firefighter enhanced cancer disability benefits.
Title
Relates to proof of eligibility for volunteer firefighter enhanced cancer disability benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.84 |
2019-12-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.738 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.360 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a5957a |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4173A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-05 | Senate | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.387 |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4173a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.360 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.360 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | print number 5957a |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04173 (Same As) 2019-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.84