NY A05960 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes provisions of law related to hunting in the county of Broome west of the Susquehanna river permanent.
Title
Makes provisions of law related to hunting in the county of Broome west of the Susquehanna river permanent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.301 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a5960 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1291 |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s3112 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.142 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.142 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S03112 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.301