NY A05965 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-5)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-23 - substituted by s8828
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a registry of workplace fatalities to record information pertaining to all incidents under which an employee suffers a fatal injury; requires the filing of 72-hour and 90-day reports pertaining to such workplace fatalities and requires the department of labor to publish such reports on the department's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a registry of workplace fatalities to record information pertaining to all incidents under which an employee suffers a fatal injury; requires the filing of 72-hour and 90-day reports pertaining to such workplace fatalities and requires the department of labor to publish such reports on the department's website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-23Assemblysubstituted by s8828
2020-07-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.302
2020-07-22Assemblyrules report cal.302
2020-07-22Assemblyreported
2020-07-22Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-07-21Assemblyreference changed to codes
2020-07-20Assemblyprint number 5965a
2020-07-20Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to labor
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to labor
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S03292 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3292B
S08828 (Same As) 2020-07-23 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback