NY A05967 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - amended on third reading 5967b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain notices to be provided to customers at least forty-five days before such telephone corporation intends to change such customer telephone service from copper-based telephone lines to fiber optic-based telephone lines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain notices to be provided to customers at least forty-five days before such telephone corporation intends to change such customer telephone service from copper-based telephone lines to fiber optic-based telephone lines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06Assemblyamended on third reading 5967b
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.203
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-03-20Assemblyprint number 5967a
2019-03-20Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-03-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-02-20Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S04029 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05967&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05967&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05967
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05967&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05967A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05967&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05967B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05967&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05967&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback