NY A05978 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-4)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - print number 5978b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - print number 5978b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that employees are automatically enrolled into the secure choice savings program and if they do not want to participate in the program, they must opt out.
Title
Ensures that employees are automatically enrolled into the secure choice savings program and if they do not want to participate in the program, they must opt out.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Assembly | print number 5978b |
2020-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 5978a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06115 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION