NY A05979 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed chap.22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to signatures for designating petitions for political subdivisions outside the city of New York and the counties of Erie and Nassau; must be signed by not less than three and three-quarters per centum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to signatures for designating petitions for political subdivisions outside the city of New York and the counties of Erie and Nassau; must be signed by not less than three and three-quarters per centum.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned chap.22
2019-03-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-03-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-12Senate3RD READING CAL.255
2019-03-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4350
2019-03-07SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-03-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-03-07Assemblypassed assembly
2019-03-04Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 5979a
2019-02-28Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.91
2019-02-27Assemblyreported
2019-02-22Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S04002 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S04350 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5979A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05979
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A05979A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A05979&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A5979#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback