NY A05981 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - signed chap.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - signed chap.109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of unlawful dissemination or publication of an intimate image and creates a private right of action for such crime.
Title
Establishes the crime of unlawful dissemination or publication of an intimate image and creates a private right of action for such crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | signed chap.109 |
2019-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-02-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.61 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1719C |
2019-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.34 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | rules report cal.34 |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01719 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - signed chap.109