NY A05982 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-06 - advanced to third reading cal.393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the personal information of a credit or debit card holder; adds zip code, e-mail address and home, cell and work telephone numbers to the personal information protected.
Title
Relates to the personal information of a credit or debit card holder; adds zip code, e-mail address and home, cell and work telephone numbers to the personal information protected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.393 |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02398 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION