NY A05991 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - signed chap.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-10 - signed chap.250
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires awarding of costs and attorney fees in frivolous actions involving public petition and participation; expands application of actions involving public petition and participation.
Title
Requires awarding of costs and attorney fees in frivolous actions involving public petition and participation; expands application of actions involving public petition and participation.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Senate | signed chap.250 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.757 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S52A |
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 5991a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.226 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.143 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.143 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00052 (Same As) 2020-11-10 - signed chap.250