NY A06019 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages the expansion of the production of fresh fruits and vegetables by community gardens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encourages the expansion of the production of fresh fruits and vegetables by community gardens.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13Senatesigned chap.272
2019-09-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-06-13SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-13Senate3RD READING CAL.428
2019-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2767A
2019-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.524
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-04-30Assemblyprint number 6019a
2019-04-30Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to agriculture
2019-02-26Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S02767 (Same As) 2019-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6019A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06019
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06019A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06019&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6019#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback