NY A06023 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - amended on third reading 6023b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - amended on third reading 6023b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires physicians and hospitals to obtain the name of the school attended by school-aged patients and to include this information in their admission registration forms.
Title
Requires physicians and hospitals to obtain the name of the school attended by school-aged patients and to include this information in their admission registration forms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6023b |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6023a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.227 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.254 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05618 (Same As) 2020-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5618B