NY A06037 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of the mortgage recording tax imposed by the city of Yonkers to August 31, 2021.
Title
Extends the expiration of the mortgage recording tax imposed by the city of Yonkers to August 31, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07358 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS