NY A06041 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.911
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - advanced to third reading cal.911
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases from 4% to 5%, the authorized rate of taxation for the hotel and motel tax in the county of Schenectady.
Title
Increases from 4% to 5%, the authorized rate of taxation for the hotel and motel tax in the county of Schenectady.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.911 |
2018-05-15 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.435 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04468 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS