NY A06047 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for service of subpoena and delivery of records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for service of subpoena and delivery of records.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.218
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.319
2018-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S4867
2018-03-20SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2018-03-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.432
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-03-28SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2017-03-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-03-28Assemblypassed assembly
2017-03-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.128
2017-03-07Assemblyreported
2017-02-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S04867 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6047

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback