NY A06048 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.219
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the authenticating effect of a party's production of material authored or otherwise created by the party.
Title
Relates to the authenticating effect of a party's production of material authored or otherwise created by the party.
Sponsors
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] |
Asm. Inez Dickens [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.219 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.321 |
2018-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4869 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.433 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2017-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.631 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4869 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.129 |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04869 (Same As) 2017-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6048