NY A06070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-15 - approval memo.33
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the New York state department of financial services and the New York state department of state's consumer protection division to conduct a study on consumer awareness and financial education in New York state and to make recommendations for a consumer awareness and financial education program.
Title
Directs the New York state department of financial services and the New York state department of state's consumer protection division to conduct a study on consumer awareness and financial education in New York state and to make recommendations for a consumer awareness and financial education program.
Sponsors
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] |
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-15 | Senate | approval memo.33 |
2020-12-15 | Senate | signed chap.324 |
2020-12-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-23 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.948 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8721 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.164 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.164 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | print number 6070a |
2020-07-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to banks |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to banks |