NY A06072 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - print number 6072a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - print number 6072a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides grants to owners of small businesses to rebuild storefronts severely damaged by Hurricane Sandy.
Title
Provides grants to owners of small businesses to rebuild storefronts severely damaged by Hurricane Sandy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Assembly | print number 6072a |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04053 (Same As) 2014-02-21 - PRINT NUMBER 4053A