NY A06074 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts guardianship motions filed under article 81 of the mental hygiene law by a fiduciary, court evaluator, guardian ad litem, court appointed attorney or by the court examiner from the required filing fee.
Title
Exempts guardianship motions filed under article 81 of the mental hygiene law by a fiduciary, court evaluator, guardian ad litem, court appointed attorney or by the court examiner from the required filing fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-09 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | committed to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.229 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.422 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-26 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S02753 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY