NY A06075 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the board of elections in cities with a population of one million or more to provide at least one interpreter for all languages that are designated city-wide languages at poll sites that contain an election district with at least fifty voting age residents whose limited English proficiency language is a designated city-wide language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the board of elections in cities with a population of one million or more to provide at least one interpreter for all languages that are designated city-wide languages at poll sites that contain an election district with at least fifty voting age residents whose limited English proficiency language is a designated city-wide language.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to election law
2019-06-17Assemblyprint number 6075b
2019-06-17Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to election law
2019-06-06Assemblyprint number 6075a
2019-06-06Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to election law
2019-02-26Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S04036 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback