NY A06078 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 6078b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - print number 6078b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds a three dollar surcharge on online delivery transactions terminating within the city of New York to be used to fund the operating costs of buses and subways in the city of New York.
Title
Adds a three dollar surcharge on online delivery transactions terminating within the city of New York to be used to fund the operating costs of buses and subways in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Michael Miller [D] | Asm. Charles Fall [D] |
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Assembly | print number 6078b |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | print number 6078a |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07991 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS