NY A06087 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases age for use of ATVs by minors from age ten to fourteen.
Title
Increases age for use of ATVs by minors from age ten to fourteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.230 |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.204 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05035 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION