NY A06092 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the crime of concealment of a human corpse.
Title
Establishes the crime of concealment of a human corpse.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.688 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | print number 6092a |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S01590 (Same As) 2014-03-05 - referred to codes