NY A06092 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to governmental employees
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the minimum retirement allowance for members of the New York state teachers' retirement system who retired prior to July 1, 1980.
Title
Relates to the minimum retirement allowance for members of the New York state teachers' retirement system who retired prior to July 1, 1980.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05676 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS