NY A06097 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Alters the definition of a qualified historic home for the purposes of the historic homeownership rehabilitation credit.
Title
Alters the definition of a qualified historic home for the purposes of the historic homeownership rehabilitation credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S00902 (Same As) 2019-01-09 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS