NY A06102 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to excluding tax levies necessary for expenditures increasing school safety or security from the school district tax levy limit.
Title
Relates to excluding tax levies necessary for expenditures increasing school safety or security from the school district tax levy limit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03080 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 3080A