NY A06113 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires orders of protection and temporary orders of protection issued in family court or in cases of family offenses in criminal court or in matrimonial actions to be translated by an interpreter into the native language of the parties.
Title
Requires orders of protection and temporary orders of protection issued in family court or in cases of family offenses in criminal court or in matrimonial actions to be translated by an interpreter into the native language of the parties.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] |
Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Nelson Castro [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-19 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 6113a |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.197 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2011-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.157 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01870 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES