NY A06113 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - print number 6113c
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for regulation of sports betting and mobile sports wagering; defines terms; implements a tax equivalent to eight and one-half percent of sports wagering gross revenue; requires reporting; provides for civil penalties for violations; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for regulation of sports betting and mobile sports wagering; defines terms; implements a tax equivalent to eight and one-half percent of sports wagering gross revenue; requires reporting; provides for civil penalties for violations; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblyprint number 6113c
2019-06-17Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-06-06Assemblyprint number 6113b
2019-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-05-29Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-02Assemblyprint number 6113a
2019-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to racing and wagering
2019-02-28Assemblyreferred to racing and wagering

Same As/Similar To

S00017 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - referred to codes

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06113&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06113&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06113
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06113&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06113A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06113&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06113B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06113&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06113C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06113&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback