NY A06140 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-23 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain transportation contracts of the Greenport public school district.
Title
Legalizes, validates, ratifies and confirms certain transportation contracts of the Greenport public school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-23 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to education |
2011-03-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03874 (Same As) 2012-03-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE