NY A06144 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-12 - approval memo.1
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the crime of aggravated strangulation for police officers or peace officers where such officer commits the crime of criminal obstruction or breathing or blood circulation, or uses a chokehold or similar restraint, and causes serious physical injury or death.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the crime of aggravated strangulation for police officers or peace officers where such officer commits the crime of criminal obstruction or breathing or blood circulation, or uses a chokehold or similar restraint, and causes serious physical injury or death.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-12Senateapproval memo.1
2020-06-12Senatesigned chap.94
2020-06-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2020-06-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-06-08Senate3RD READING CAL.693
2020-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6670B
2020-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-06-08Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.62
2020-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.62
2020-06-08Assemblyreported
2020-06-08Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-05Assemblyprint number 6144b
2020-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to codes
2019-10-23Assemblyprint number 6144a
2019-10-23Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2019-02-28Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06670 (Same As) 2020-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6144B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06144
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06144A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06144B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A6144#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06144&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback