NY A06149 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - signed chap.541
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to home inspection professional licensing; requires home inspection professionals to pass the National Home Inspector examination.
Title
Relates to home inspection professional licensing; requires home inspection professionals to pass the National Home Inspector examination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Senate | signed chap.541 |
2019-11-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1062 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4122 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.205 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04122 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - signed chap.541