NY A06170 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-06 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the eligibility dates for a military service recognition scholarship to include certain conflicts beginning on and after June 1, 1982.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the eligibility dates for a military service recognition scholarship to include certain conflicts beginning on and after June 1, 1982.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-01-06Assemblyreferred to higher education
2015-03-16Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S02974 (Same As) 2016-05-04 - referred to higher education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback