NY A06175 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to develop a public awareness campaign promoting businesses located in New York state; requires the creating of the Buy New York Online Networking Directory to connect purchasers with businesses located in New York.
Title
Authorizes the empire state development corporation to develop a public awareness campaign promoting businesses located in New York state; requires the creating of the Buy New York Online Networking Directory to connect purchasers with businesses located in New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-28 | Senate | tabled |
2018-12-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.331 |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-04-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-04-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.98 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S622A |
2018-03-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.693 |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | print number 6175a |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S00622 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6175A