NY A06193 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.72
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to home heating system conversion; requires written notice regarding such conversion.
Title
Relates to home heating system conversion; requires written notice regarding such conversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.72 |
2019-12-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.725 |
2019-12-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.450 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | substituted for a6193a |
2019-06-17 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1424 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 3360A |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s3360a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.450 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.450 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | print number 6193a |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S03360 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.72