NY A06210 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits an insurer to rescind or retroactively cancel a policy in circumstance involving an accident staged to defraud an insurer.
Title
Permits an insurer to rescind or retroactively cancel a policy in circumstance involving an accident staged to defraud an insurer.
Sponsors
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S00643 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - referred to insurance